This a quiz based on the concept and trick to multiply big number easily and saving time in the competitive examinations, this trick was earlier discussed in the following post : Multiplication trick

Easy multiplication Quiz

Start

Congratulations - you have completed Easy multiplication Quiz.
You scored %%SCORE%% out of %%TOTAL%%.
Your performance has been rated as %%RATING%%

Your answers are highlighted below.

Question 1

How much is 61 x 27 =

A

2237

B

1247

C

1647

D

1547

Question 2

How much is 62 x 13 =

A

806

B

816

C

206

D

906

Question 3

How much is 44 x 22 =

A

978

B

1098

C

998

D

968

Question 4

How much is 41 x 53 =

A

2953

B

2173

C

2293

D

1173

Question 5

How much is 33 x 22

A

656

B

526

C

746

D

726

Once you are finished, click the button below. Any items you have not completed will be marked incorrect.
Get Results

There are 5 questions to complete.

←

List

→

Return

Shaded items are complete.

1

2

3

4

5

End

Return

You have completed

questions

question

Your score is

Correct

Wrong

Partial-Credit

You have not finished your quiz. If you leave this page, your progress will be lost.

Correct Answer

You Selected

Not Attempted

Final Score on Quiz

Attempted Questions Correct

Attempted Questions Wrong

Questions Not Attempted

Total Questions on Quiz

Question Details

Results

Date

Score

Hint

Time allowed

minutes

seconds

Time used

Answer Choice(s) Selected

Question Text

All done

Need more practice!

Keep trying!

Not bad!

Good work!

Perfect!

If you liked my contribution, please donate or click on any of advt. a little that will be generated will all be donated for noble cause. [paypal-donation] [ad#Textads-BetPost]